EP1764674 - Input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prados, Michael 4009 Miranda Avenue 94304 Palo Alto / US | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 06007647.8 | 12.04.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | US20050717088P | 14.09.2005 Original published format: US 717088 P | US20050728656P | 20.10.2005 Original published format: US 728656 P | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764674 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764674 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764674 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, B60K37/02, B60K37/06, G06F3/033 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/22 (EP,US);
B60K35/25 (EP,US);
B60K35/50 (EP,US);
B60K35/53 (EP,US);
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
B60K2360/143 (EP,US);
B60R11/02 (EP,US);
B60R11/0235 (EP,US);
B60R11/0264 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | G06F3/01, B60K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | Eingabevorrichtung | [2007/12] | English: | Input device | [2007/12] | French: | Dispositif d'introduction | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2006 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | IT | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | MC | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09167541 (IDEC IZUMI CORP); | [AD]US6118435 (FUJITA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003067449 (YOSHIKAWA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003184574 (PHILLIPS JAMES V [US], et al); | [Y]WO2004081776 (HANDSHAKE INTERACTIVE TECHNOLO [CA], et al); | [A]WO2004097573 (TAPWAVE INC [US], et al); | [AD]EP1560102 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [Y]EP1571032 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) | Examination | EP1544720 | by applicant | US4885565 | WO9721160 | DE19731285 | WO9926230 | US5988902 | US6118435 | DE20102197U | WO0154109 | DE20022244U | DE20180024U | US6429846 | US2003067449 | WO03038800 | WO03041046 | US2003184574 | WO2004081776 | EP0920704 | EP1544720 | EP1560102 | EP1571032 | WO2005EP08634 |