EP1713108 - Key assembly for electric or electronic device in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bleckmann, Michael Auf der Heide 6a 58239 Schwerte-Ergste / DE | 02 /
Braeker, Tobias Viermärker Weg 13 58313 Herdecke / DE | [2006/42] | Application number, filing date | 06007661.9 | 12.04.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | DE20051017255 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005017255 | DE20051017254 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005017254 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1713108 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1713108 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713108 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/705, H01H13/84 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H01H13/705 (EP);
H01H2221/058 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | H01H13/705 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Tastenanordnung für ein elektrisches oder elektronisches Gerät in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2006/42] | English: | Key assembly for electric or electronic device in a vehicle | [2006/42] | French: | Ensemble de touches pour dispositif électrique ou électronique dans une voiture | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 10.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IE | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | LV | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SE | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | AT | 12.04.2011 | LU | 12.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
AT | 12.04.2011 | ||
LU | 12.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
AT | 12.04.2011 | ||
LU | 12.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
AT | 12.04.2011 | ||
LU | 12.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
AT | 12.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.02.2011 | |
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2134600 (IBM) [X] 1,3-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0088365 (PREH ELEKTRO FEINMECHANIK [DE]) [X] 1,3-9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3421319 (BORG INSTR GMBH [DE]) [X] 2-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4786766 (KOBAYASHI AKIHIKO [JP]) [A] 6,9* figure 19 *; | [X]EP1316979 (SUNARROW LTD [JP]) [X] 2-6,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US6765158 (MORRISON GERALD O [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2a * | by applicant | EP0008365 | DE10316934 |