EP1845323 - Process and device for producing a high pressure product by cryogenic separation of air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corduan, Horst Allinger Strasse 21 82178 Puchheim / DE | 02 /
Ewert, Ulrich Ludlmühlstrasse 32c 83673 Bichl / DE | 03 /
Pompl, Gerhard Am Steinbügl 19 92339 Beilngries / DE | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Imhof, Dietmar Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Imhof, Dietmar Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 06007760.9 | 13.04.2006 | [2007/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845323 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04, G05B13/00 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
F25J3/04836 (EP,US);
F25J1/00 (KR);
F25J3/0409 (EP,US);
F25J3/04103 (EP,US);
F25J3/04296 (EP,US);
F25J3/04412 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2008/26] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Druckprodukts durch Tieftemperatur-Luftzerlegung | [2007/42] | English: | Process and device for producing a high pressure product by cryogenic separation of air | [2007/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de production d'un produit sous haute pression par séparation cryogénique d'air | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5471843 (CHRETIEN DENIS [FR]) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 40 - line 50 * * column 5, line 4 - line 12 * * column 5, line 30 - line 35 * * column 6, line 14 - line 24; figures 1,6 *; | [X]EP1586838 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0009] , [0033]; figure - *; | [X]DE10103957 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 6, line 9 - line 18; figure 2 *; | [DA]EP1542102 (LINDE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US6666049 (KATENDE EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 33 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2006002958 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2006002958 A 20060105 (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |