EP1724483 - Pressure piece assembly for a synchromesh device and a synchromesh device for a gearbox, in particular for motor vehicules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Jan-Peter Gartenstrasse 9a 14550 Gross-Kreutz / DE | [2006/47] | Application number, filing date | 06007939.9 | 15.04.2006 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | DE20051023248 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005023248 | [2006/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724483 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724483 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/06 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F16D23/06 (EP);
F16D2023/0618 (EP);
F16D23/0612 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/30] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckstückeinheit für eine Synchronisiereinrichtung und Synchronisiereinrichtung für Schaltgetriebe, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2006/47] | English: | Pressure piece assembly for a synchromesh device and a synchromesh device for a gearbox, in particular for motor vehicules | [2006/47] | French: | Poussoir pour un dispositif de synchronisation et dispositif de synchronisation pour boîte de vitesses, en particulier pour véhicule automobiles | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 08.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.06.2009 | [2011/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1555158 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1-7,12,13,16-18,20 * figure - *; | [X]EP0870941 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-10,12-14,16,17,20 * figure - *; | [X]FR2803640 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-7,12,13,16-18,20 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE10006347 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-16,18-20 * column 5, line 40 - line 44; figures 4-6; claim 2 *; | [X]DE20216782U (SCHWARZBICH JOERG [DE]) [X] 1-7,12-20 * figure - *; | [A]EP1460298 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 11-20* paragraph [0025]; figure - * |