EP1722214 - Gas sensor arrangement and measuring method for improving long-term stability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Raychem GmbH Finsinger Feld 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frodl, Robert Zauberwaldstrasse 8 81825 München / DE | 02 /
Loewe, Hans-Dirk Grabenfleckstrasse 4 81249 München / DE | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008441.5 | 24.04.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | DE20051022288 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005022288 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722214 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, G01N21/61 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N21/274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Title | German: | Gassensoranordnung und Messverfahren für erhöhte Langzeitstabilität | [2006/46] | English: | Gas sensor arrangement and measuring method for improving long-term stability | [2006/46] | French: | Dispositif de capteur de gaz et procédé de mesure pour améliorer La stabilité à long terme | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.07.2009 | 23.06.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/47] | 10.07.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 27.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57190252 ; | [A]JPH05223735 ; | [A]EP0762107 (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ]) [A] 1-11 * figure 5; claim 6 *; | [X]DE19944260 (INST CHEMO BIOSENSORIK [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 36 - line 46; figure 2 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 17 * * column 6, line 23 - line 65 *; | [X]US6843102 (SHULGA ALEKSANDR [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 5, line 49 - line 53 * * column 9, line 39 - line 46 * * column 11, line 5 - line 26 *; | [PA]EP1605251 (TYCO ELECTRONICS RAYCHEM GMBH [DE], et al) [PA] 1-11* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830216), vol. 007, no. 038, Database accession no. (P - 176), & JP57190252 A 19821122 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931208), vol. 017, no. 666, Database accession no. (P - 1656), & JP05223735 A 19930831 (HORIBA LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |