EP1849698 - Energy storage wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Toller, Julian Holzwiesenweg 16a 85598 Baldham-Vaterstetten / DE | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008506.5 | 25.04.2006 | [2007/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849698 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62M1/10 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B62M1/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/28] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Energiespeicherrad | [2007/44] | English: | Energy storage wheel | [2007/44] | French: | Roue d'accumulation d'énergie | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/45] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4423342 (RUDNIK WITOLD [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2002020984 (DUNKLEY JASON [CA]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE10212455 (BROCKHAUS ROLF [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5882026 (HOPGOOD HENRY ARTHUR [NZ]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2558555 (MENACHE RENE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE176818 (HUGELIN, D.) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | DE4423342 |