EP1754447 - Surgical electric tool, actuating unit and calibration method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Leibinger GmbH & Co. KG Bötzinger Strasse 41 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ippisch, Andreas Abtshof 5 79291 Merdingen / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Röthinger, Rainer c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008508.1 | 25.04.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | DE20051038864 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038864 | [2007/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754447 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1754447 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754447 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16, A61C1/00, H01H13/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/1626 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,US);
A61C1/0015 (EP,US);
H01H2300/014 (EP,US);
H01H9/0214 (EP,US);
H01H9/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | A61B17/16, A61C1/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/50] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Elektrowerkzeug, Betätigungseinheit und Kalibrierungsverfahren hierfür | [2007/08] | English: | Surgical electric tool, actuating unit and calibration method therefor | [2007/08] | French: | Outil électrique chirurgical, unité d'actionnement et procédé d'étalonnage correspondant | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US6037724 (BUSS BRIAN A [US], et al) [DA] 1,10 * column 1, lines 54-64 * * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 63 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2002049464 (DONOFRIO WILLIAM T [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 1, paragraphs 2,8 * * page 3, paragraph 28 * * page 4, paragraph 35 * * page 6, paragraph 47 * * figures 1-3c *; | [A]US6500169 (DENG WENJIE [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 1, lines 5-10 * * column 2, lines 15-64 * * column 3, line 37 - column 11, line 46 ** figure 2 * | by applicant | US3463990 | US6037724 |