EP1716847 - Bioabsorbable pharmaceutical formulation comprising a PLGA copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyaji, Tatsuaki, c/o NIPRO Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaki-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Makoto, c/o NIPRO Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaki-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 03 /
Murayama, Tamaki, c/o NIPRO Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaki-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 04 /
Hoashi, Yohei, c/o NIPRO Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaki-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 05 /
Saito, Hisae, c/o NIPRO Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaki-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 06 /
Okada, Takao, c/o Taki Chemical Co., Ltd. 2, Befuchomidori-machi Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675-0124 / JP | 07 /
Imamura, Yukari, c/o Taki Chemical Co., Ltd. 2, Befuchomidori-machi Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675-0124 / JP | 08 /
Fujiyama, Yoshimichi, c/o Taki Chemical Co., Ltd. 2, Befuchomidori-machi Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675-0124 / JP | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008539.6 | 25.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050131893 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005131893 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716847 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716847 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K38/09, A61K38/24 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K38/09 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Bioabsorbierbare pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung enthaltend einen PLGA-Copolymer | [2006/44] | English: | Bioabsorbable pharmaceutical formulation comprising a PLGA copolymer | [2006/44] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique bioabsorbable contenant un copolymère de PLGA | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.01.2008 | CH | 02.01.2008 | CY | 02.01.2008 | CZ | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | EE | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | LI | 02.01.2008 | LT | 02.01.2008 | LV | 02.01.2008 | PL | 02.01.2008 | RO | 02.01.2008 | SI | 02.01.2008 | SK | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | BG | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | IE | 25.04.2008 | LU | 25.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | IS | 02.05.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | HU | 03.07.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
LU | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
HU | 03.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
LU | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LV | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | BE | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 02.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4728721 (YAMAMOTO MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * example - *; | [Y]US4789726 (HUTCHINSON FRANCIS G [GB]) [Y] 1,2* column 1 *; | [Y]EP0442671 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * examples 2,3 *; | [X]US5585460 (YAMADA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * Comparative examples 1,3; columns 4,5 *; | [Y]EP0839525 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * example - *; | [Y]EP1048301 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * example 5 *; | [Y]US2002173467 (KAMEI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * Comparative examples 2, 4; paragraph [0140]; examples 11,12,15 *; | [Y]EP1310517 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0052] - [0058] - [0070]; table 1 *; | [X]US2004241229 (YAMAMOTO KAZUMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0077] , [0082] , [0083] , [0096] , [0097] , [0102] * |