Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4918808B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | B2 | JP2006328060 | 07.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005131893 | 28.04.2005 | JP2006122909 | 27.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7342048 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2008 | B2 | US2006246139 | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005131893 | 28.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1716847 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2008 | B1 | EP1716847 | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005131893 | 28.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE382337T | 15.01.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005131893 | 28.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006000381T | 18.12.2008 | T2 | DE602006000381D1 | 14.02.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005131893 | 28.04.2005 |