EP1717795 - Transducer for stringed musical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/44] | Stringed musical instrument, transducer for the same and its mounting structure on the same | ||
[2007/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | ||
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takabayashi, Yojiro c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | 02 /
Hori, Kenta c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | [2007/30] |
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
Takabayashi, Yojiro c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | ||
02 /
Hori, Kenta c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | |||
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
Takabayashi, Yojiro c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Hori, Kenta c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Takabayashi, Yojiro c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008772.3 | 27.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050131425 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005131425 | JP20050131434 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005131434 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717795 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717795 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10H3/18, G10D1/08 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G10H3/185 (EP,US);
G10H3/18 (KR);
G10H2220/501 (EP,US);
G10H2220/525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Wandler für Saiteninstrument | [2007/26] | English: | Transducer for stringed musical instrument | [2007/26] | French: | Transducteur pour instrument de musique à cordes | [2007/26] |
Former [2006/44] | Saiteninstrument, Wandler dafür und dessen Montagestruktur | ||
Former [2006/44] | Stringed musical instrument, transducer for the same and its mounting structure on the same | ||
Former [2006/44] | Instrument de musique à cordes, transducteur pour celui-ci et sa structure de montage sur celui-ci | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 08.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | LT | 07.11.2007 | LV | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | PL | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | IS | 07.03.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | LU | 27.04.2008 | IE | 28.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 27.04.2008 | ||
IE | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
LV | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3668295 (BROUSSARD PAUL DANIEL) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 1, line 29 - line 42; figure 3 * [A] 5,8-10; | [XA]US3733425 (CHAKI K) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 14; figures 3-6 * [A] 3,4; | [A]US4218951 (TRESSEL WILLARD [US]) [A] 5,8-10* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 30; figure 3 *; | [X]US4941389 (WENDLER DAVID C [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5078041 (SCHMUED LAURENCE C [US]) [A] 3,4 * column 6, line 10 - line 44; figure 2 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 17 *; | [A]US6605771 (BAGGS LLOYD R [US]) [A] 2,7 * column 3, line 4 - line 18; figures 2,3 * * column 8, line 17 - line 36 *; | [A]US6822156 (LAZARUS ARNOLD M [US], et al) [A] 3,4 * column 10, line 20 - line 28; figure 4 * * column 11, line 36 - line 59 * |