EP1681355 - Sequence-specific DNA recombination in eukaryotic cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dröge, Peter 100 Nanyang Crescent Meadows 11-01 Singapore 637819 / SG | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dröge, Peter 100 Nanyang Crescent, Meadows 10-01 Singapore 637819 / SG | 02 /
Christ, Nicole Merovingerstrasse 31 50677 Köln / DE | 03 /
Lorbach, Elke Eythstrasse 105 51103 Köln / DE | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008807.7 | 29.08.2000 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | DE1999141186 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941186 | [2006/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681355 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1681355 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/90, C12N15/85, C12N5/10, A61K48/00, A61K31/70, A01K67/027 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
A61P3/06 (EP);
C12N15/79 (KR);
C12N15/907 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C12N15/90 (EP,US);
C12N15/902 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/29] | Title | German: | Sequenz-spezifische DNA-Rekombination in eukaryotischen Zellen | [2006/29] | English: | Sequence-specific DNA recombination in eukaryotic cells | [2006/29] | French: | Recombinaison avec une séquence spécifique d'ADN dans des cellules eukaryotes | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.01.2008 | 18.12.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00965792.5 / EP1214440 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9640722 (CELTRIX PHARMA [US]) [X] 20-25 * figure 3 *; | [Y]WO9747758 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-28* abstract *; | [X] - "Bacteriophage lambda genome", EMBL SEQUENCES, (19951025), XP002164455 [X] 20 * vgl. seq. 5 mit nt 27581-27823 * | [PX] - LORBACH E. ET AL., "Site-specific recombination in human cells catalyzed by phage lambda integrase mutants.", J. MOL. BIOL., (20000310), vol. 296, pages 1175 - 1181, XP002164453 [PX] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.3532 | [Y] - CHRIST N. & DRÖGE P., "Alterations in the directionality of lambda site-specific recombination catalyzed by mutant integrases in vivo.", J. MOL. BIOL., (19990521), vol. 288, pages 825 - 836, XP002164454 [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.2730 | by applicant | - GOTTESMAN, M.; WEISBERG, R., The Bacteriophage Lambda, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1971), page 113 | - LANDY, A., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 58, page 913 | - LANGE-GUSTAFSON, B.; NASH, H., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 259, page 12724 | - CHRIST, N.; DRÖGE, P., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 288, page 825 |