EP1720252 - Load drive apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasue, Satoka c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2008/10] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
Yasue, Satoka Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008826.7 | 27.04.2006 | [2006/45] | Priority number, date | JP20050132210 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005132210 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720252 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720252 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/19 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H03K5/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/28] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lastansteuerungsvorrichtung | [2008/08] | English: | Load drive apparatus | [2006/45] | French: | Appareil de commande de la charge | [2006/45] |
Former [2006/45] | Ladelaufwerkgerät | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5675297 (GOSE MARK WENDELL [US], et al) [A] 1-6* columns 3-6; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1463203 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * columns 3-8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005083066 (TANI SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |