EP1849934 - Automatic pool cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tianjin Wangyuan Environmental Protection & Technology Co., Ltd. 3-D, Zhongxiao Yuan Micro-electronics Industrial Park (XiQing) TEDA Tianjin, Post Code : 300385 / CN | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fu, Guilan c/o Tianjin Wangyuan Env. Prot. & Tech. Co., Ltd 3-D Zhongxiac Yuan, Micro-Elec. Ind. Park (XiQing), TEDA, Tianjin / CN | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06008847.3 | 27.04.2006 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849934 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849934 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/16 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
E04H4/1654 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Title | German: | Automatisches Schwimmbadreinigungsgerät | [2007/44] | English: | Automatic pool cleaner | [2007/44] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage automatique de piscine | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | BG | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | LV | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | GB | 27.04.2010 | IE | 27.04.2010 | LU | 27.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
GB | 27.04.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
LU | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
GB | 27.04.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 27.04.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 27.04.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 27.04.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9009498 (SUENNEN JEAN ALBERT FRANCOIS [BE]) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 4; figures 2,3 *; | [X]FR2685374 (NICOLOFF PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 16 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]FR2729995 (SARL VBV [FR]) [AD] 4* page 6, line 20 - line 24; figures 1,2 * |