EP1691401 - Method for polishing a substrate using CMP abrasive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/33] | CMP abrasive, method for polishing substrate and method for manufacturing semiconductor device using the same, and additive for CMP abrasive | ||
[2012/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyama, Naoyuki 4-9-12, Suwa-cho, Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0001 / JP | 02 /
Haga, Kouji Namekawa-ryo 210 20-13, Namekawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0053 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Masato 3-7-25, Matsushiro, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | 04 /
Hirai, Keizou 847-115, Tenjinbayashi-cho Hitachiota-shi Ibaraki 313-0049 / JP | 05 /
Ashizawa, Toranosuke 315-18, Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | 06 /
Machii, Youiti 23-2 Kamitakatsushinmachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0819 / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2007/06] | 01 /
Koyama, Naoyuki 4-9-12, Suwa-cho, Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
Haga, Kouji Namekawa-ryo 210 20-13, Namekawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0053 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshida, Masato 3-7-25, Matsushiro, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | |||
04 /
Hirai, Keizou 847-115, Tenjinbayashi-cho Hitachiota-shi Ibaraki 313-0049 / JP | |||
05 /
Ashizawa, Toranosuke 315-18, Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | |||
06 /
Machii, Youiti 23-2 Kamitakatsushinmachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0819 / JP | |||
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
Koyama, Naoyuki 4-9-12, Suwa-cho, Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
Haga, Kouji Namekawa-ryo 210 20-13, Namekawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0053 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshida, Masato 3-7-25, Matsushiro, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | |||
04 /
Hirai, Keizou 847-115, Tenjinbayashi-cho Hitachiota-shi Ibaraki 313-0049 / JP | |||
05 /
Ashizawa, Toranosuke 315-18, Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | |||
06 /
Machii, Youiti 9-1-822, Kohoku 2-chome Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0032 / JP | |||
Former [2006/33] | 01 /
Koyama, Naoyuki Hitachi Kasei Matsushiro Hausu A 302 4-3, Matsushiro 3-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | ||
02 /
Haga, Kouji Namekawa-ryo 210 20-13, Namekawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0053 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshida, Masato Hitachi Kasei Matsushiro Hausu 202 4-3, Matsushiro 3-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | |||
04 /
Hirai, Keizou 847-115, Tenjinbayashi-cho Hitachiota-shi Ibaraki 313-0049 / JP | |||
05 /
Ashizawa, Toranosuke 315-18, Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | |||
06 /
Machii, Youiti 9-1-822, Kohoku 2-chome Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0032 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009641.9 | 15.06.2000 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | JP19990172821 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17282199 | JP19990204842 | 19.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20484299 | JP19990332221 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33222199 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1691401 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1691401 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1691401 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3105 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
H01L21/31053 (EP,US);
C09K3/14 (KR);
C09G1/02 (EP,US);
C09K3/1409 (EP,US);
C09K3/1463 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/30625 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | H01L21/304 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN EIN SUBSTRAT ZU POLIEREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES CMP SCHLEIFMITTELS | [2012/03] | English: | Method for polishing a substrate using CMP abrasive | [2012/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE POLISSAGE D'UN SUBSTRAT UTILISANT UN COMPOSE ABRASIF CMP | [2012/03] |
Former [2006/33] | CMP Schleifmittel, Verfahren ein Substrat zu polieren und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Halbleiteranordnungen unter Verwendung desselben und Zusatz zu einem CMP Schleifmittel | ||
Former [2006/33] | CMP abrasive, method for polishing substrate and method for manufacturing semiconductor device using the same, and additive for CMP abrasive | ||
Former [2006/33] | Compose abrasif CMP, procede de polissage d'un substrat, procede de fabrication d'un dispositif à semiconducteur utilisant ledit compose, et additif pour compose abrasif CMP | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00937240.0 / EP1205965 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000937240) is 27.02.2003 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4222747 (DAUGUET JEAN-CLAUDE, et al) [X] 1-9,12 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0373501 (MITSUBISHI MONSANTO CHEM [JP]) [X] 12 * claim 3 * * claims 1-6 * [A] 1-11; | [X]EP0781822 (SYMBIOS LOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1,10-12 * page 6, columns 6,7 * * page 2, line 8 * * page 5, lines 17,18 * * page 4, lines 24-37 * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 1 * * page 4, lines 19,20 ** claims 7,12 *; | [X]EP0820092 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,10-12 * page 8, line 13 - line 32 * * page 9, line 53 - page 10, line 12 *; | [X]US5738800 (HOSALI SHARATH D [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * column 4, lines 21-46; claim 8; table 4 *; | [X]EP0846740 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-6,10-12 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9964527 (RODEL INC [US]) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4222747 | EP0373501 | EP0781822 | EP0820092 | US5738800 | EP0846740 | WO9964527 |