EP1722248 - A relay test device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/46] | A relay test device | ||
[2009/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2009/29] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimura, Atsushi Denso Corp. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009697.1 | 10.05.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | JP20050137723 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005137723 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722248 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722248 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/327, B60R16/00 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G01R31/3278 (EP,US);
G01R31/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Relais-Prüfvorrichtung und-verfahren | [2009/20] | English: | A relay test device and method | [2009/20] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'essai de relais | [2009/20] |
Former [2006/46] | Relais-Prüfvorrichtung | ||
Former [2006/46] | A relay test device | ||
Former [2006/46] | Dispositif d'essai de relais | Examination procedure | 29.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 17.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004047097 (THOMAS JORDAN PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-21* paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * | by applicant | JPH0835452 | JP2003254172 |