EP1854602 - Device for the cutting to size of edge strips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeidler, Armin Böttgerstrasse 12 95100 Selb / DE | [2007/46] | Application number, filing date | 06009893.6 | 12.05.2006 | [2007/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1854602 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1854602 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B27D5/00, B26B17/00, B26B29/06 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
B27D5/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ablängen von Umleimern | [2007/46] | English: | Device for the cutting to size of edge strips | [2007/46] | French: | Dispositif pour couper à la longueur voulue des bandes de chant | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2009 | Observations by third parties | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | IE | 25.08.2010 | IT | 25.08.2010 | LT | 25.08.2010 | LV | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | PL | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | LU | 12.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
TR | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 25.08.2010 | |
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 25.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE8028742U (NOIZET, ERWIN) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US5005454 (FLETCHER M RAY [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]DE20308339U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0673731 | by applicant | US5005454 | DE20308339U | other | ES2006852 | EP0673731 |