EP1734290 - Actuation device for a coupling sleeve of a gearbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pechtl, Volker Fleischbankgasse 10 92224 Amberg / DE | 02 /
Schnapp, Peter Gaismannshofstrasse 48 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2006/51] | Application number, filing date | 06009905.8 | 13.05.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | DE20051028094 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028094 | [2006/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1734290 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1734290 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1734290 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/32 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
F16H63/32 (EP);
F16H2063/327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/46] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Betätigungsvorrichtung für eine Schaltmuffe in einem Zahnräderwechselgetriebe | [2006/51] | English: | Actuation device for a coupling sleeve of a gearbox | [2006/51] | French: | Dispositif d'actionnement d'un manchon d'accouplement d'une boîte de vitesses | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 26.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE925152 (HANNOVERSCHE MASCHB AG) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-12 * page 2, line 33 - line 65 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR1350298 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1-4,8-10 * figure 2 *; | [X]JPS58195222 (KOWA SEIKOU KK) [X] 1-4,8-10 * abstract *; | [X]EP1072826 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-7,10 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]JP2003083448 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO, et al) [X] 1,2* abstract * | by applicant | DE4322586 | DE19927321 | DE10045506 | DE10032163 | DE10125098 | DE10125450 | DE10209227 | DE10309407 |