EP1721549 - Sitting or lying furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states himolla Polstermöbel GmbH Landshuter Strasse 38 84416 Taufkirchen / Vils / DE | [2011/18] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Riessner, Hans-Georg Schönbornstrasse 5 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Koch, Antonio Hirtenstrasse 9 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch Antonio Hirtenstrasse 9 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2010/31] |
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Dörr, Matthias, et al FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Klingseisen, Franz Zumstein & Klingseisen Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010004.7 | 15.05.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | DE20052007610U | 13.05.2005 Original published format: DE 202005007610 U | [2006/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721549 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1721549 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/40, A47C1/035 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A47C7/38 (EP);
A47C15/002 (EP);
A47C7/402 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI, NL [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sitz- oder Liegemöbel | [2006/46] | English: | Sitting or lying furniture | [2006/46] | French: | Meuble de couchage ou d'assise | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 16.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE158394 (OTTO KILLMEY) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]DE19505335 (HOHENLOHER SPEZIALMOEBEL [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]BE1010302 (NOMET MANAGEMENT SERV BV [NL]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10114403 (HIRSCH PETER [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |