18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
04.05.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
17.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
03.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
27.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
20.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
25.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
27.05.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
24.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.01.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2011 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
19.11.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
25.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
19.10.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
22.03.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|