Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7895791 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2011 | B2 | US2007271846 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06010071 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1857983 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2011 | B1 | EP1857983 | 21.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06010071 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE515007T | 15.07.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP06010071 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2589231 | 06.10.2009 | C | CA2589231 | 16.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06010071 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1857983T | 10.10.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP06010071 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2366196T | 18.10.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP06010071 | 16.05.2006 |