EP1724315 - Ink composition, inkjet recording method and process for producing lithographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoai, Toshiaki Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010110.2 | 16.05.2006 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | JP20050144951 | 18.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005144951 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1724315 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1724315 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724315 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/10, B41M7/00, B41C1/10 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
B41C1/1066 (EP,US);
B41M7/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Title | German: | Tintenzusammensetzung, Verfahren zur Tintenstrahlaufzeichnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographischen Druckplatte | [2006/47] | English: | Ink composition, inkjet recording method and process for producing lithographic printing plate | [2006/47] | French: | Composition d'encre, procédé d'impression par jet d'encre et procédé de fabrication d'une plaque d'impression lithographique | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 21.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.12.2008 | BE | 24.12.2008 | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IT | 24.12.2008 | LT | 24.12.2008 | LV | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | PL | 24.12.2008 | RO | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | BG | 24.03.2009 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | IS | 24.04.2009 | IE | 16.05.2009 | LU | 16.05.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | FR | 02.06.2009 | HU | 25.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
LU | 16.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
HU | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
LU | 16.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 24.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004059385 ; | [A]US4088801 (BOLON DONALD A, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 43 - column 4, line 57 * * example - *; | [A]EP0187045 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 7 - line 29 * * page 10, line 6 - line 16 *; | [A]WO2004059385 (WANG BAIZHI [CN])[A] 6,8,9; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 56, Database accession no. 2004-580467, XP002434230 & WO2004059385 A1 20040715 (WANG B) [A] 6,8,9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH069714 | JPH0656970 | JP2001031892 | JP2001040068 | JP2001055507 | JP2001220526 | JP2001310938 | JP2001310937 |