EP1726612 - Carbon dioxide blown low density, flexible microcellular polyurethane elastomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Younes, Usama E. 103 Standing Rock Drive McMurray PA 15317 / US | 02 /
Baily, David M. 2510 Giant Oaks Drive Upper St. Clair PA 15241 / US | 03 /
Carpenter, Charles R. 1650 Red Mill Drive Upper St. Clair PA 15241 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Perchenek, Nils, et al Bayer MaterialScience AG L&P/P&L 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2006/48] | Perchenek, Nils, et al Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010160.7 | 17.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20050139847 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 139847 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1726612 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1726612 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726612 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/12, C08G18/66 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/76 (KR);
A43B13/04 (KR);
C08G18/4841 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08G18/70 (KR);
C08J9/122 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0066 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/6674 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | Niedrige Dichte aufweisender mikrozellulärer Carbondioxid geblasener Polyurethanelastomerweichschaum | [2006/48] | English: | Carbon dioxide blown low density, flexible microcellular polyurethane elastomers | [2006/48] | French: | Mousse flexible élastomèrique de polyuréthane ayant une densité réduite en utilisant du carbon dioxide comme agent de gonflage | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2006 | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | GB | 17.05.2012 | IE | 17.05.2012 | LU | 17.05.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
GB | 17.05.2012 | ||
IE | 17.05.2012 | ||
LU | 17.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
GB | 17.05.2012 | ||
IE | 17.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3916873 (ELASTOGRAN POLYURETHANE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,12,18,22-24,31,34,35,39,41,44,45,49,51 * column 1, lines 3-10 * * column 2, lines 38-48 * * columns 11-12; example 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1225199 (BAYER ANTWERPEN NV [BE]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1,8,18 *; | [X]EP1466932 (HUNTSMAN INT LLC [US]) [X] 24,26,31,33* sentences 41,42; example 2 * |