EP1777443 - Gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN METAL GASKET CO., LTD. 3308, Aza Deguchi, Oaza Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi Saitama 360-0843 / JP | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueta, Kosaku c/o Japan Metal Gasket Co., Ltd. 3308,Aza Deguchi Oaza Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi Saitama 360-0843 / JP | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Henseler, Daniela Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Henseler, Daniela Sparing, Röhl, Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010377.7 | 19.05.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | JP20050305790 | 20.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005305790 | JP20050364972 | 19.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005364972 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777443 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777443 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
F16J15/0818 (EP,US);
B21D53/74 (KR);
B21D1/02 (KR);
B21D43/08 (KR);
B21D43/287 (KR);
B21D5/08 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/01] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dichtung | [2007/17] | English: | Gasket | [2007/17] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000028001 (NIHON METAL GASKET) [X] 1 * abstract ** figures 2,8 *; | [DX]JP2002005292 (NIHON METAL GASKET) [DX] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0020] * * figures 1-12 * | by applicant | JP2002005292 | JP2002031237 |