EP1714718 - Continuous pressure molten metal supply system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-001 / US | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPLE, Vivek M. Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 02 /
REIGHARD, Scott E. Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 03 /
PAOLA, Vincent A. Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 04 /
CHABAL, Ronald G. Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Stute, Ivo Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 200 221 40100 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/15] | Stute, Ivo Peter, et al Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Bergen, Klaus, et al Patentanwalt Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010464.3 | 18.04.2002 | [2006/43] | Priority number, date | US20010284952P | 19.04.2001 Original published format: US 284952 P | US20010957846 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 957846 | US20010014649 | 11.12.2001 Original published format: US 14649 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714718 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714718 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/20, B22D39/02, B22D18/04, B22D17/30 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
B22D17/2015 (EP,US);
B21C33/02 (EP,US);
B22D11/00 (EP,US);
B22D11/10 (EP,US);
B22D17/20 (EP,US);
B22D17/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Metallschmelzezuführung unter Druck | [2006/43] | English: | Continuous pressure molten metal supply system and method | [2006/43] | French: | Système d'alimentation en metal liquide par pression continue et procédé | [2006/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02764237.0 / EP1395380 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | TR | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/02] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | NL | 09.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5092499 (SODDERLAND GEORGE A [CA]) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [A]US5443187 (SAMUELSON SVEN-ERIK [SE]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |