EP1762624 - Methods for amplifying genetic material and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Court of the University of Edinburgh Old College South Bridge Edinburgh EH8 9YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF EDINBURGH Old College South Bridge Edinburgh EH8 9YL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melton, David William 7 Frogston Terrace Edinburgh EH10 7AD / GB | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 06010492.4 | 21.12.2000 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | GB20000001401 | 22.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0001401 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1762624 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1762624 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/00, C12N15/85, A01K67/027 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
C12N15/873 (EP,US);
C12N15/90 (EP,US);
C12N9/1077 (EP,US);
C12N9/6464 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21069 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | C12N15/85, A01K67/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Amplifizierung genetischen Materials und dessen Anwendungen | [2007/11] | English: | Methods for amplifying genetic material and uses thereof | [2007/11] | French: | Techniques d'amplification de matériel génétique et utilisations de celles-ci | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00985674.1 / EP1263985 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5523226 (WHEELER MATTHEW B [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]WO9707669 (ROSLIN INST EDINBURGH [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 20 * * claims *; | [A]WO9830683 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9938008 (PROLIFARON INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 6 * * examples *; | [T] - MELTON DAVID W ET AL, "A one-step gene amplification system for use in cultured mammalian cells and transgenic animals.", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, (200104), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0962-8819, pages 133 - 142, XP002949500 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008951732020 | [A] - MAGIN T M ET AL, "A position- and orientation-dependent element in the first intron is required for expression of the mouse hprt gene in embryonic stem cells.", GENE 15 DEC 1992, (19921215), vol. 122, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 289 - 296, XP002451225 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - DEWEY M J ET AL, "MOSAIC MICE WITH TERATO CARCINOMA DERIVED MUTANT CELLS DEFICIENT IN HYPO XANTHINE PHOSPHO RIBOSYL TRANSFERASE EC-2.4.2.8", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1977 (RECD 1978) E, (1977), vol. 74, no. 12, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5564 - 5568, XP001051828 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.74.12.5564 |