EP1691179 - Ladenwaage zum Abwickeln einzelner Vorgänge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo (Albstadt) GmbH Unter dem Malesfelsen 34 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mürdter, Herbert Unter Nank 60 Tailfingen 72461 Albstadt / DE | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010666.3 | 26.07.2001 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | DE20001039705 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10039705 | [2006/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1691179 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1691179 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/414 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
G01G23/3728 (EP,US);
G01G19/4144 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/202 (EP,US);
G08C15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/33] | Title | German: | Shop scale for handling individual processes | [2006/33] | English: | Ladenwaage zum Abwickeln einzelner Vorgänge | [2006/33] | French: | Balance de magasin permettant d'exécuter différents processus | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/28] | 04.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2013 | 04.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01958025.7 / EP1310140 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010958025) is 01.03.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0295658 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XY]GB2252188 (HERBERT & SONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6 * page 3, line 30 - line 34 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 4 * * page 6, line 27 - line 30 * * claim 1 * * figures 5,6 * [Y] 1-17; | [Y]EP0890927 (ZHS ZUERCHER HARD UND SOFTWARE [DE]) [Y] 1-17* the whole document * |