EP1726237 - Brush and associated production method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M+C Schiffer GmbH Industriestrasse 4 53577 Neustadt-Wied / DE | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clos, Thomas Brühler Strasse 289 50968 Köln / DE | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010811.5 | 26.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | DE20051024082 | 25.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005024082 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726237 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726237 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A46B3/06, A46B9/06, A46D3/04, A46D3/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A46B3/06 (EP);
A46B15/0075 (EP);
A46D3/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] |
Former [2007/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bürste und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2006/48] | English: | Brush and associated production method | [2006/48] | French: | Brosse et son procédé de fabrication | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | IE | 23.03.2011 | IT | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | NL | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | AT | 26.05.2011 | LU | 26.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
AT | 26.05.2011 | ||
LU | 26.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
AT | 26.05.2011 | ||
LU | 26.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
AT | 26.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.03.2011 | |
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0360766 (MARINO ANTONIO) [Y] 1,2,4-9,15,16,19-22,24,25 * the whole document *; | [YDA]EP0623298 (SCHIFFER FA M & C [DE]) [YD] 1-9,15-17,19-26 * abstract * * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 50 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 10-14,18; | [XA]WO0103546 (PROEMM HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 7, lines 21-23 * * page 8, line 1 * * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 5 * * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 16 * * figures 3,5,7 * [A] 2-14; | [A]US2002017003 (KRAMER HANS [DE], et al) [A] 7 * abstract ** figures 1-36 *; | [Y]WO03097324 (CORONET WERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3,15,17,23,26 * abstract * * page 19, lines 7-16 * * page 23, lines 17-33 * * figures 13,31,40 *; | [A]US6886207 (SOLANKI SANJAY AMRATLAL [GB]) [A] 6,16 * abstract * * column 4, lines 4-19 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0623298 | DE20013862U | DE10164336 | DE10221716 |