EP1728435 - Process and device for forming a bed of viscous confectionery mass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sollich KG Siemensstrasse 17-23 32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sollich, Thomas Albernberg 30 32689 Kalletal / DE | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2006/49] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06010934.5 | 26.05.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | DE20051024701 | 30.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005024701 | [2006/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1728435 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1728435 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/02, A23G3/12, A23G1/20, A23G3/20, A23G3/00, A23G3/06 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A23G3/0027 (EP);
A23G3/0034 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/49] | A23G3/06, A23G3/00 | Designated contracting states | ES, IT, NL [2012/02] |
Former [2007/33] | DE, ES, IT, NL | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausformen eines Produktteppichs aus viskoser Süsswarenmasse | [2006/49] | English: | Process and device for forming a bed of viscous confectionery mass | [2006/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour former un lit de produit à base de masse sucrée visqueuse | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.07.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1552570 (BOUDINOT STIMSON) [Y] 2,3,5,6,10 * page 1, line 56 - line 72 * * page 2, line 12 - line 18 * * page 2, line 43 - line 47 * * page 2, line 77 - line 83; figure - *; | [XY]US2960045 (KURT PENTZLIN) [X] 1,4,7-9 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 15 - line 17; figure -; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,10; | [X]US6001403 (KOBAYASHI MASAO [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7* column 3, line 16 - line 40; figure - * | by applicant | US1552570 | US2960045 | US6001403 |