EP1726437 - Inkjet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAPHTEC KABUSHIKI KAISHA 503-10, Shinano-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Masatoshi c/o Graphtec K.K. 503-10, Shinano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Hiroshi c/o Graphtec K.K. 503-10, Shinano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Sachio c/o Graphtec K.K. 503-10, Shinano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Nishijima, Michiharu c/o Graphtec K.K. 503-10, Shinano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Yonao, Masahide c/o Graphtec K.K. 503-10, Shinano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Yamada, Takuya c/o Graphtec K.K. 503-10, Shinano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichtstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06011001.2 | 29.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | JP20050154757 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005154757 | JP20050295801 | 11.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005295801 | JP20050295802 | 11.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005295802 | JP20050295803 | 11.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005295803 | JP20060116401 | 20.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006116401 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1726437 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1726437 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17509 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsvorrichtung | [2006/48] | English: | Inkjet recording apparatus | [2006/48] | French: | Appareil d'impression à jet d'encre | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/32] | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB189714181 (GLOVER RICHARD THOMAS [GB], et al) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 25 - line 35 *; | [Y]EP0839659 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 8 * column 11, line 28 - line 56 *; | [XY]EP0863017 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 7,9-22 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 26 * * column 7, line 24 - line 39 * [Y] 8,25,26; | [Y]EP1053874 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 31 * paragraph [0136] *; | [XY]US6188417 (KEEFE BRIAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,23,24,27-30,32,33 * column 10, line 22 - line 33 * * column 11, line 1 - line 12 * * column 14, line 60 - column 19, line 52 * * column 18, line 29 - line 34 * [Y] 6,26,31; | [X]US6203146 (PAWLOWSKI NORMAN E JR [US], et al) [X] 1-5* column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 6 *; | [Y]US2004227792 (IIJIMA SHOTA [JP], et al) [Y] 25 * paragraph [0048] * | by applicant | JP2002240316 | JP2003326732 |