EP1757195 - Method for manufacturing cigarettes with multiple compartment filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/09] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing cigarettes with multiple compartment filters | ||
[2007/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlisio, Siegfried Tulpenweg 41 21502 Geesthacht / DE | 02 /
Oesterling, Erwin Am Sportplatz 54 21509 Glinde / DE | [2007/09] | Application number, filing date | 06011153.1 | 27.11.1999 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998156934 | 10.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19856934 | [2007/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1757195 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1757195 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1757195 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/52 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A24D3/0287 (EP,US);
A24C5/478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Filterzigaretten mit Mehrfachfiltern | [2007/09] | English: | Method for manufacturing cigarettes with multiple compartment filters | [2007/41] | French: | Méthode pour fabriquer des cigarettes à filtres à plusieurs compartiments | [2007/41] |
Former [2007/09] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing cigarettes with multiple compartment filters | ||
Former [2007/09] | Méthode et appareil pour fabriquer des cigarettes à filtres à plusieurs compartiments | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99123622.5 / EP1016350 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | GB | 16.01.2008 | IE | 16.01.2008 | SE | 16.04.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | ES | 27.04.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/01] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | DK | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
ES | 27.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB959345 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 23 - line 28; figures 1,18; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4301816 (WAHLE GUENTER, et al) [Y] 1-3 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US5425383 (GARTHAFFNER MARTIN T [US], et al) [Y] 1-3* figure 2 * |