Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1757195 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2008 | B1 | EP1757195 | 07.03.2007 | A3 | EP1757195 | 28.02.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99123622 | 27.11.1999 | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59914146D1 | 22.02.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | DE59914146 | 27.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6701934 | 09.03.2004 | B2 | US2002174873 | 28.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45786399 | 10.12.1999 | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | US19315802 | 12.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000166530 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1016350 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2007 | B1 | EP1016350 | 09.03.2005 | A3 | EP1016350 | 05.07.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE383782T | 15.02.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1112862C | 02.07.2003 | C | CN1256098 | 14.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19856934 | 15.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59914611D1 | 06.03.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL189169B | 30.06.2005 | B1 | PL337051 | 19.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6427699 | 06.08.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856934 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Earlier application | EP1016350 |