EP1731725 - Oil pan for automotive engines and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benussi, Giampaolo Corso Matteotti, 15 25122 Brescia / IT | For all designated states Benussi, Franco Via San Rocchino, 52 25123 Brescia / IT | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Autuori, Angelo, et al Eureka IP Consulting Via Monte Cengio, 32 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Autuori, Angelo, et al EUREKA IP Consulting Borgo Santa Lucia, 31 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2009/13] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph, et al Maroscia & Associati S.r.l. Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2008/50] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph, et al Maroscia & Associati s.r.l. Contrà S. Caterina, 29 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2008/46] | Pajola, Stefano, et al Maroscia & Associati Srl Contrà S. Caterina, 29 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2008/42] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph, et al Maroscia & Associati s.r.l. Contrà S. Caterina, 29 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2006/50] | Vannini, Mario Maroscia & Associati S.r.l. Contra' S. Caterina, 29 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 06011429.5 | 01.06.2006 | [2006/50] | Priority number, date | IT2005BS00067 | 06.06.2005 Original published format: IT BS20050067 | [2006/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1731725 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1731725 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/00 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
F01M11/0004 (EP);
F01M2011/007 (EP);
F01M2011/0091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Title | German: | Ölwanne für Brennkraftmaschine und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2006/50] | English: | Oil pan for automotive engines and method of making same | [2006/50] | French: | Carter d'huile pour moteur à combustion et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4938314 (SITZLER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 16-18* column 2, line 3 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1055803 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10,16-18 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031]; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US2002096221 (KAPCOE JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,16-18 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US6584950 (CUNNINGHAM ROBERT R [US]) [A] 7,8 * column 3, line 6 - line 30; figure 1 * |