EP1693501 - Carbon dioxide dry cleaning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cool Clean Technologies, Inc. 915 Blue Gentian Road, Suite 11 Eagon, MN 55121 / US | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Chart, Inc. 3505 County Road 42 West Burnsville, MN 55306-3803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preston, Duane A. 4430 87th St. Lubbock, Texas 79424 / US | 02 /
Turner, Jon R. 11786 177th St. West Lakeville Minnesota 55044 / US | 03 /
Svoboda, Charles 105 Main St. West New Prague Minnesota 56071 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Larcher, Dominique, et al Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Larcher, Dominique, et al Cabinet Vidon, 16 B, rue Jouanet, B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cédex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2008/01] | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2006/34] | Parkinson, Neil Scott, et al Marks & Clerk, 83-85 Mosley Street, Sussex House Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 06011587.0 | 15.04.2002 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | US20010835168 | 13.04.2001 Original published format: US 835168 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1693501 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1693501 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06F43/00, D06F43/02, D06F43/08 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
D06F43/007 (EP,US);
D06F43/00 (EP,US);
D06F43/02 (EP,US);
D06F43/08 (EP,US);
D06F43/081 (EP,US);
F17C7/02 (EP,US);
F17C2205/013 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0146 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,US);
F17C2205/035 (EP,US);
F17C2221/013 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/035 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0135 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0304 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0346 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0355 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0393 (EP,US);
F17C2250/032 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0408 (EP,US);
F17C2250/043 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0434 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0439 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0452 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0491 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0631 (EP,US);
F17C2260/032 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | D06F43/08, D06F43/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/16] |
Former [2008/11] | |||
Former [2006/34] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Trockenreinigung mit Kohlendioxid | [2006/34] | English: | Carbon dioxide dry cleaning system | [2006/34] | French: | Nettoyage à sec par gaz carbonique | [2006/34] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02252635.4 / EP1249529 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees IT, GB, FR, DE | 04.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2007 | 30.04.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5850747 (ROBERTS JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 41 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US5970554 (SHORE STEPHEN H [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, lines 1-42 * * column 6, lines 5-13,63-67 * * column 7, lines 1-8 * * column 8, lines 11-23,38-42 * * figures 1-3A * [A] 5; | [A]WO0001871 (FEDEGARI AUTOCLAVI [IT], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 7, lines 24-27; figure 1 * * page 5, line 25 - page 7, line 17 *; | [A]WO0019000 (AGA AB [SE]) [A] 5,6,22 * page 3, line 28 - page 5, line 20 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 13 ** figures 1,2 *; | [XA]WO0053839 (SAIL STAR LIMITED [CN]) [X] 6-9,15-19,22-24,29,30 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 14 * * page 13, line 30 - page 14, line 13 * * figures 1-8 * [A] 1,4,5; | [XA]EP1055766 (MVE INC [US]) [X] 6-30 * whole document * [A] 1-5; | [XA]WO0123658 (MICELL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 4 * page 10, lines 15-34; figure 1 * * page 15, lines 23-33; figure 2 * [A] 1-3,5 |