EP1736868 - Abstracted display building method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mann, Joseph Francis W288 S5023 Rockwood Trail Waukesha WI 53189 / US | 02 /
Britt, Clinton Duane 1327 N. 39th Street Milwaukee WI 53208 / US | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Englaender, Klaus, et al HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Jung HML Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06011756.1 | 07.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | US20050147604 | 07.06.2005 Original published format: US 147604 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736868 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1736868 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/22 (US);
H04L67/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/36] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erzeugung einer abstrahierten Anzeige | [2006/52] | English: | Abstracted display building method and system | [2006/52] | French: | Procédé et système de construction d'affichage abstrait | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 27.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.01.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/03] | 10.08.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/03] | Appeal following examination | 06.04.2016 | Appeal received No. T1541/16 | 06.06.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.08.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 10.08.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.08.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10013275.2 / EP2278458 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0195041 (HONEYWELL LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 19,20 * * claim 1 * * page 19 * * page 43 - page 44 * * page 30 - page 31 * * page 18 * * page 68 *; | [X]WO2004086160 (FISHER ROSEMOUNT SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 4,5,20 ** claim 1 * | by applicant | WO0195041 |