07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
29.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
10.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
26.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
15.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
04.12.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
13.11.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
05.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
05.12.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
27.11.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.09.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.06.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
27.06.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
15.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
08.12.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] |