Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE420054T | 15.01.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AT4542005 | 05.07.2005 | EP06011910 | 09.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007006755 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT4542005 | 05.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1741664 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2009 | B1 | EP1741664 | 21.11.2007 | A3 | EP1741664 | 10.01.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AT4542005 | 05.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT8927U | 15.02.2007 | U1 | Priority number | Date | AT4542005 | 05.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502006002548D1 | 26.02.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AT4542005 | 05.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2320916T | 29.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AT4542005 | 05.07.2005 |