EP1700845 - Insecticidal anthranilamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lahm, George P. 148 Fairhill Drive Wilmington DE 19808 / US | 02 /
Myers, Brian J. 102 East Ruddy Duck Circle Oxford PA 19363 / US | 03 /
Selby, Thomas P. 820 Benge Road Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 04 /
Stevenson, Thomas M. 103 Iroquois Court Newark DE 19702 / US | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Lahm, George P. 148 Fairhill Drive Wilmington DE 19808 / US | ||
02 /
Myers, Brian J. 102 East Ruddy Duck Circle Oxford PA 19363 / US | |||
03 /
Selby, Thomas P. 116 Hunter Court Wilmington DE 19808 / US | |||
04 /
Stevenson, Thomas M. 103 Iroquois Court Newark DE 19702 / US | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06012017.7 | 20.03.2001 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | US20000191242P | 22.03.2000 Original published format: US 191242 P | US20000220232P | 24.07.2000 Original published format: US 220232 P | US20000254635P | 11.12.2000 Original published format: US 254635 P | US20010262015P | 17.01.2001 Original published format: US 262015 P | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700845 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1700845 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/30, C07D231/14, C07D213/82, C07D239/28, C07D231/06, A01N37/22, A01N43/56, A01N43/40, A01N43/54 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
A01N37/22 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N43/08 (EP,US);
A01N43/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/42 (EP,US);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/647 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A01N43/84 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A01N47/02 (EP,US);
C07C237/42 (EP,US);
C07C237/44 (EP,US);
C07C255/29 (EP,US);
C07C255/57 (EP,US);
C07C317/28 (EP,US);
C07C317/44 (EP,US);
C07C323/42 (EP,US);
C07C323/62 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D231/06 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,US);
C07D233/90 (EP,US);
C07D235/08 (EP,US);
C07D239/28 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D275/03 (EP,US);
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
C07D295/192 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/37] | Title | German: | Insektizide Anthranilamide | [2008/28] | English: | Insecticidal anthranilamides | [2006/37] | French: | Anthranilamides insecticides | [2008/28] |
Former [2006/37] | insektizide anthranilamide | ||
Former [2006/37] | anthranilamides insecticides | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01924277.5 / EP1265850 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4321371 (PARG ADOLF, et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - line 12 * * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 33; examples 28,57,58 *; | [DY]NL9202078 (RIJKSLANDBOUWHOGESCHOOL) [DY] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 3 * * example - *; | [X]DE4428380 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 11 - line 25 * * page 16, line 6 - page 18, line 33 * * example 33 *; | [A]US5602126 (BARNETTE WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5728693 (STEVENSON THOMAS MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 17 - line 35 * * table 1 *; | [A]DE19840322 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 10 - line 31 * * page 4, line 32 - line 37 * * table 1 * * page 7, line 43 - page 8, line 40 *; | [A] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT/MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 7311021, XP002177117 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - SUTO, MARK J ET AL, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM., NL, (1995), vol. 36, no. 40, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7213 - 7216 | by applicant | WO9010623 | WO9200673 | NL9202078 | - T. L. GILCHRIST, Comprehensive Organic Synthesis, PERGAMON PRESS, vol. 7, pages 748 - 750 | - M. TISLER; B. STANOVNIK, Comprehensive Heterocyclic Chemistry, PERGAMON PRESS, vol. 3, pages 18 - 19 | - M. R. GRIMMETT; B. R. T. KEENE, Advances in Heterocyclic Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 43, pages 139 - 151 | - TISLER; B. STANOVNIK, Advances in Heterocyclic Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 9, pages 285 - 291 | - G. W. H. CHEESEMAN; E. S. G. WERSTIUK, Advances in Heterocyclic Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 22, pages 390 - 392 | - ORG. SYNTH., (1955), vol. 3, page 557 | - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1902), vol. 24, page 1035 | - RANEY NICKEL, ORG. SYNTH. COLL., vol. VI, page 581 |