EP1734394 - Positioning system for eliminating lost motion effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mauro, George 16 Northwestern Drive Salem, NH 03079 / US | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06012093.8 | 13.06.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | US20050151081 | 13.06.2005 Original published format: US 151081 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734394 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/26, G02B21/00, G01B11/00, G01D5/347 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G02B21/26 (EP,US);
G01D5/347 (EP,US);
G01D2205/95 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Positionierungssystem zum Eliminieren des Totgangs | [2006/51] | English: | Positioning system for eliminating lost motion effect | [2006/51] | French: | Système de positionnement pour l'élimination du mouvement perdu | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3330964 (HOBROUGH GILBERT L, et al) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 30 ** figure 1 *; | [X]US4074131 (SCHWEBEL REINER) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 16 * * claims 1,6,11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3909855 (EMS TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 11 * * column 6, line 7 - line 64 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0482553 (SUESS KG KARL [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column 4, line 20 - line 46 * * column 6, line 2 - line 22 * * figure 3 *; | [A]DE19511973 (UNIV ILMENAU TECH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1,2 * * figure 5 * |