EP1736765 - Eddy current test probe for eddy current testing of a lead-through duct of a reactor pressure vessel cover of a nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states intelligeNDT Systems & Services GmbH Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2009/27] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states intelligeNDT Systems & Services GmbH & Co. KG Freyeslebenstrasse 1 91058 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pöpperl, Dieter-Nikolaus Hirschbergstrasse 4 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Mörtel & Höfner Patentanwälte Äussere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2006/52] | Application number, filing date | 06012208.2 | 14.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | DE20051028858 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028858 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736765 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736765 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/90 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
G01N27/904 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Wirbelstrom-Prüfsonde für die Wirbelstromprüfung einer Durchführung eines Reaktordruckbehälterdeckels eines Kernreaktors | [2006/52] | English: | Eddy current test probe for eddy current testing of a lead-through duct of a reactor pressure vessel cover of a nuclear reactor | [2006/52] | French: | Sonde de test à courant de Foucault pour le test du courant Foucault de la traversée d'un couvercle de caisson sous pression d'un réacteur nucléaire | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 09.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.08.2008 | CZ | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IE | 20.08.2008 | IT | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | LV | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | PL | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | SI | 20.08.2008 | SK | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | BG | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | IS | 20.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | HU | 21.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
HU | 21.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 20.08.2008 | |
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 20.08.2008 | |
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2037787 (FOERSTER F) [A] 1-8 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2641798 (FOERSTER FRIEDRICH DR) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0569617 (BBC REAKTOR GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4330909 (BBC REAKTOR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0801304 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 13, line 9 - line 13 * * figure 32 *; | [X]US2005062470 (SHOJI SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0204] * * figure - * |