30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
29.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
10.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
26.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
04.12.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
24.07.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
05.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
03.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
20.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
15.08.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
14.08.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.08.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.08.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
31.08.2007 |
First examination report |
|
28.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
29.12.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] |