Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1748196 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2008 | B1 | EP1748196 | 31.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20051441 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE408760T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20051441 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006002791D1 | 30.10.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20051441 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20051441 | 27.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20051441 | 26.07.2005 |