EP1724116 - Liquid jetting head and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akahane, Fujio c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Uesugi, Ryoji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012254.6 | 27.12.2002 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | JP20010396067 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001396067 | JP20020102950 | 04.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002102950 | JP20020190562 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002190562 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1724116 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1724116 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/16, B41J2/14 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B41J2/1632 (EP,US);
B41J2/14274 (EP,US);
B41J2/1612 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1626 (EP,US);
B41J2/1634 (EP,US);
B41J2/1637 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | B41J2/14, B41J2/16 | Designated contracting states | GB [2008/48] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsausstosskopf und dazugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2006/47] | English: | Liquid jetting head and method of manufacturing the same | [2006/47] | French: | Tête d'éjection de liquide et sa méthode de fabrication | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 20.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.12.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02029032.6 / EP1323532 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1020292 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 21 * abstract *; | [A]EP1024005 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 21 * figures 14A-14C *; | [A]US6305782 (KISHIMA KOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 21 * figures 21,22 * * column 23, line 29 - line 42 ** column 25, line 29 - line 33 * |