EP1742388 - Multimode optical fibre communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bothwell, Andrew 84 Tuddenham Road Ipswich Suffolk IP4 2SZ / GB | 02 /
Meadowcroft, Simon 3 Shakespeare Road, Stowmarket Suffolk IP14 1TU / GB | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nußbaumstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012267.8 | 14.06.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | GB20050013898 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0513898 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1742388 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742388 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/13, H04B10/155 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H04B10/2581 (EP,US);
H04B10/40 (EP,US);
H04B10/504 (EP,US);
H04B10/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/37] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Multimodenes, faseroptisches Übertragungssystem | [2009/18] | English: | Multimode optical fibre communication system | [2007/02] | French: | Système de transmission à fibre optique multimode | [2007/02] |
Former [2007/02] | Mutlimodenes, faseroptisches Übertragungssystem | Examination procedure | 01.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 31.03.2010 | [2010/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0339326 (KRONE AG [DE]) [X] 1-10* column 5, lines 8-30; figures 1,4 * |