EP1737043 - Insulated gate-type semiconductor device and manufacturing method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 2-5-5 Keihanhondori Moriguchi-city Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd 2-5-5 Keihanhondori Moriguchi-city Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Hiroyasu 101, Guest House Apio 3004, Yoshida, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma 370-0523 / JP | 02 /
Mandai, Tadao 557-3, Kokai Oizumi-machi, Oragun Gunma 370-0524 / JP | 03 /
Ushida, Atsuya 101, City-house Aoki 2203 Kokai, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma 370-0524 / JP | 04 /
Saito, Hiroaki 7-2, Jyosai-cho Ota-city Gunma 373-0038 / JP | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012426.0 | 16.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | JP20050182487 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005182487 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1737043 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1737043 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H02J7/00, H01L21/336, // H01L29/06, H01L29/08 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0696 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/086 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66734 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/0029 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | H01L29/78, H02J7/00, H01L21/336 | Designated contracting states | FI [2009/08] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement mit isoliertem Gate und das Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung | [2006/52] | English: | Insulated gate-type semiconductor device and manufacturing method of the same | [2006/52] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur à grille isolée et procédé de fabrication | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 12.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3919978 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10,15-19 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0746042 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * figures 6,8-11,13 and associated text *; | [A]US2002096709 (WU YUJING [US], et al) [A] 9-11,18,19 * figure 2 ** paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0028] *; | [A]EP1244150 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-10,15-19 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0032] * |