EP1746562 - Apparatus and method for controlling display segments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
You, Byeong-Gyun 935-1202, Samsung Taeyoung Apt. 969-1 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2007/04] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012609.1 | 20.06.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | KR20050066947 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: KR 20050066947 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1746562 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1746562 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/04 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G09G3/04 (EP,US);
H04N5/44 (KR);
G09G2310/0275 (EP,US);
G09G5/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/30] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ansteuerung von Anzeigesegmenten | [2007/04] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling display segments | [2007/04] | French: | Appareil et procédé de commande de segments d'affichage | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2008 | 30.06.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0510716 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 28 - line 42 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 2 ** column 6, line 24 - line 41 *; | [XY]US6567978 (JARRELL LESTER L [US]) [X] 1,2,4-12 * figures 2,3 * * column 7, line 6 - line 31 * * column 7, line 24 - line 27 * [Y] 3 |