EP1772977 - Mobile communication device with low power signal detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behzad, Arya c/o Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US | 02 /
Rofougaran, Ahmadreza 33 Vista Luci Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | [2012/08] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Behzad, Arya c/o Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US | ||
02 /
Rofougaran, Ahmadreza 33 Vista Luci Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012742.0 | 21.06.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | US20050723994P | 06.10.2005 Original published format: US 723994 P | US20050297881 | 07.12.2005 Original published format: US 297881 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772977 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772977 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772977 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04B1/16, H04W52/02 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04W52/028 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | H04B7/26, H04B1/16 | ||
Former IPC [2007/15] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/30] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobilkommunikationsgerät mit Detektor für Signale mit geringer Leistung | [2007/15] | English: | Mobile communication device with low power signal detector | [2007/15] | French: | Appareil de communication mobile à détecteur de signaux de faible puissance | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 25.05.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9011652 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 15 * [I] 4,6,10; | [A]US5487181 (DAILEY TIMOTHY E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2001041551 (ROTZOLL ROBERT R [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2003119568 (MENARD RAYMOND J [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0095] *; | [A]EP1353447 (ZARLINK SEMICONDUCTOR AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]US2005043068 (SHOHARA AKI [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [I]US2005130713 (SIMPSON FLOYD D [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * |