EP1746062 - Suspension arrangement with swing damper and method of damping thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALTROTORS, SIA Instituta str. 1 Salaspils Rigas raj. LV-2169 / LV | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darznieks, Vilis Laboratorijas str. 21-18 1009 Riga / LV | 02 /
Martinsons, Andris Meza str. 2169 Salaspils / LV | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Zvirgzds, Arnolds Agency Arnopatents, IU Brivibas Street 162-17 1012 Riga / LV | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Zvirgzds, Arnolds Agency Arnopatents, IU Brivibas Street 162-17 LV-1012 Riga / LV | Application number, filing date | 06012783.4 | 21.06.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | LV20050000073 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: LV 050073 | [2007/04] | Filing language | LV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1746062 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1746062 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/00, B66C3/00 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
F16F9/145 (EP);
B66C3/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/36] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufhängeanordnung mit Schwingungsdämpfer und Verfahren zur Schwingungsdämpfung | [2007/04] | English: | Suspension arrangement with swing damper and method of damping thereof | [2007/04] | French: | Ensemble de suspension avec amortisseur d'oscillations et procédé d'amortissement d'oscillations | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4723639 (HUNGERFORD EMORY D [US]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO0073195 (INDEXATOR AB [SE], et al) [YD] 1-9 * page 2, lines 31-33; figure 1 *; | [X]US6206440 (MCCALLUM DENNIS L [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 4, lines 10-19 ** column 5, lines 44-47; figure - * |