EP1736289 - Apparatus for roughing surfaces, particularly in the machining of slabs of hard material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/52] | Method and apparatus for roughing surfaces, particularly in the machining of slabs of hard material | ||
[2009/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lovato, Claudio Via Barbarani 12 37123 Verona / IT | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Pajola, Stefano, et al Maroscia & Associati Srl Piazza del Castello, 26 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Pajola, Stefano, et al Maroscia & Associati S.r.l Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2008/46] | Pajola, Stefano, et al Maroscia & Associati Srl Contrà S. Caterina, 29 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2008/42] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph, et al Maroscia & Associati s.r.l. Contrà S. Caterina, 29 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2006/52] | Vannini, Mario Maroscia & Associati S.r.l. Contra' S. Caterina, 29 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 06012847.7 | 22.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | IT2005VI00182 | 24.06.2005 Original published format: IT VI20050182 | [2006/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736289 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736289 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/26 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
B28D1/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufrauhen von Oberflächen, insbesondere beim Bearbeiten von Platten aus hartem Material | [2009/11] | English: | Apparatus for roughing surfaces, particularly in the machining of slabs of hard material | [2009/11] | French: | Appareil de surfaçage en particulier pour des plaques de matière dur | [2009/11] |
Former [2006/52] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufrauhen von Oberflächen, insbesondere beim Bearbeiten von Platten aus hartem Material | ||
Former [2006/52] | Method and apparatus for roughing surfaces, particularly in the machining of slabs of hard material | ||
Former [2006/52] | Procédé et appareil de surfaçage en particulier pour des plaques de matière dur | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | LT | 05.08.2009 | LV | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | IS | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2012/37] | CY | 05.08.2009 | |
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | EE | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0422610 (HOFMANN HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 50 * * column 8, line 48 - column 11, line 2; figures 2-4 *; | [X]DE19953239 (KLOCKENKAEMPER DIETER [DE]) [X] 8* column 3, line 8 - line 29; figure 2 * |