EP1736657 - Apparatus and method for judging a piston position in a engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyama, Yuichi c/o Automotive Systems, Engine Man. Syst. Div. Intellectual Property Department HITACHI LTD. 1671-1 Kasukawa-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma-ken, 372-0023 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Hirokazu c/o Automotive Systems, Engine Man. Syst. Div. Intellectual Property Department HITACHI, LTD. 1671-1 Kasukawa-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma-ken 372-0023 / JP | [2013/28] |
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
Toyama, Yuichi c/o Automotive Syst. Hitachi Ltd. 1671-1 Kasukawa Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken 372-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimizu, Hirokazu c/o Automotive Syst. Hitachi Ltd. 1671-1 Kasukawa Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken 372-0023 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012877.4 | 22.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | JP20050183773 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005183773 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736657 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1736657 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736657 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/34, F02D13/02 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
F02D41/009 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | F02D41/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/33] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Position eines Kolbens eines Motors | [2006/52] | English: | Apparatus and method for judging a piston position in a engine | [2006/52] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour déterminer la position d'un piston d'un moteur | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 06.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6223722 (SHIMIZU HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 3, line 1 - line 24 *; | [X]US2004010363 (WATANUKI TAKUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,12,13,18-20 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0077] *; | [XP]JP2005240606 (DENSO CORP) [XP] 1-3,12-14* abstract * | by applicant | US6223722 | US2004010363 | JP2004044470 | JP2005240606 |