EP1736374 - Roll over protection system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasubke, Wolfgang Averwetters Feld 5b 49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2010/45] | Application number, filing date | 06012905.3 | 22.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | DE20051028964 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028964 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736374 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736374 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/13 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
B60R21/13 (EP);
B60R2021/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Überrollschutzsystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2006/52] | English: | Roll over protection system for a motor vehicle | [2006/52] | French: | Système d'arceau de sécurité pour un véhicule à moteur | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2008 | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 29.06.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/41] | 01.12.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2010/33] | 29.06.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2010/33] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | ES | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | GR | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | IE | 05.01.2011 | IS | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | LT | 05.01.2011 | LU | 05.01.2011 | LV | 05.01.2011 | NL | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | PT | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | AT | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2015/33] |
Former [2014/38] | BG | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
ES | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 05.01.2011 | ||
HU | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IS | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PT | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
ES | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
HU | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IS | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PT | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
ES | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
HU | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IS | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/45] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
HU | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IS | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IS | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IS | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IS | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CZ | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CZ | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
AT | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CZ | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CZ | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | DK | 05.01.2011 | |
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | SI | 05.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9421370U (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [DY]DE4437925 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]US6511095 (KOBER PEER-OLAF [DE], et al); | [Y]DE102004016362 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE4437925 | DE102004016362 |